EP0473476 - Straight edge real-time localisation device and process in a numerical image, especially for pattern recognition in a scene analysis process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.1996 [1996/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-TRT DEFENSE 88, rue Brillat-Savarin F-75013 Paris / FR | [1992/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dufour, Jean-Yves THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, Cédex 67 F-92045 Paris la Défense / FR | 02 /
Le Gall, Serge THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, Cédex 67 F-92045 Paris la Défense / FR | 03 /
Waldburger, Hugues THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, Cédex 67 F-92045 Paris la Défense / FR | [1992/10] | Representative(s) | Lincot, Georges, et al Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellectuelle, Département Brevets, 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/20] | Lincot, Georges, et al THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329, 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1992/10] | Turlèque, Clotilde THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329, 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 91402126.6 | 30.07.1991 | [1992/10] | Priority number, date | FR19900009742 | 31.07.1990 Original published format: FR 9009742 | [1992/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0473476 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/68, G06K9/46 | [1992/10] | CPC: |
G06T7/12 (EP,US);
G06V10/457 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10032 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10048 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30184 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, NL, SE [1992/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Realzeit-Lokalisierung von geraden Kanten in einem numerischen Bild, insbesondere für die Mustererkennung in einem Szenenanalyseprozess | [1992/10] | English: | Straight edge real-time localisation device and process in a numerical image, especially for pattern recognition in a scene analysis process | [1992/10] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de localisation en temps réel de contours rectilignes dans une image numérisée, notamment pour la reconnaissance de formes dans un traitement d'analyse de scène | [1992/10] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 25.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/34] | 16.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/51] | 23.07.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1996 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8703118 (NCR CO [US]); | [Y]EP0229543 (THOMSON CGR [FR]); | [A]EP0279297 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]); | [A]US4910786 (EICHEL PAUL H [US]) |