|
15.04.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2000 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2000 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.2000 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2000 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2000 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.2000 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.2000 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.10.2000 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.10.2000 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.10.2000 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.10.2000 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
18 |
|
18.10.2000 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.09.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2000 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.09.2000 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.2000 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
35 |
|
11.09.2000 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.09.2000 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
11.09.2000 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.09.2000 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.09.2000 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.06.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.06.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.06.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.06.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.06.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.06.2000 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2000 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2000 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2000 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.05.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.05.2000 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2000 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2000 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2000 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2000 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.2000 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.1999 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.1999 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.1999 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.1998 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.01.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.11.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.10.1997 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1997 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1997 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1997 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.06.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.06.1997 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
22 |
|
11.06.1997 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
121 |
|
06.06.1997 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
15.04.1997 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.1997 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.1997 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.1997 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.1997 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.1997 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.1997 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.1997 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.1997 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.02.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.02.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.02.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.02.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.02.1997 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.02.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.02.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.02.1997 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
13 |
|
07.02.1997 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.1997 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.1997 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
07.02.1997 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.1997 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.1997 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.1997 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.02.1997 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.02.1997 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.1997 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.1997 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.1996 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.11.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.11.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.11.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.11.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
23 |
|
25.05.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.05.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.04.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.1996 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.1996 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.03.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.1996 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.01.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1996 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.10.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.1995 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.1995 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.1995 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.09.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.09.1995 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
19.09.1995 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.06.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.06.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.1995 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.06.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.05.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.05.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.05.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.05.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.05.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
08.05.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.05.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.05.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
08.05.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.05.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
08.05.1995 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
11 |
|
05.05.1995 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.1995 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.1995 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.12.1994 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.12.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.1994 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.08.1994 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.1994 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.1994 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.1994 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.1994 |
N/A |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.06.1994 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.1994 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.1994 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.1994 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.06.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.1994 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
14.06.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
13 |
|
09.06.1994 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
05.08.1993 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.1993 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.1993 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.05.1993 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.03.1993 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.03.1993 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.1993 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.1993 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
19.01.1993 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.1992 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.1991 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.1991 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.1991 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.1991 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.1991 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.07.1991 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
30.07.1991 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.1991 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.07.1991 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.07.1991 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
30.07.1991 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.05.1986 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.05.1986 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |