EP0469992 - 6-Alkylpyridazine derivatives, process for their preparation and compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.1995 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/44] | For all designated states SANOFI 32-34, rue Marbeuf F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1992/19] | For all designated states ELF SANOFI 32-34, rue Marbeuf F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1992/06] | For all designated states SANOFI 40, Avenue George V F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boigegrain, Robert Cemin de Peret F-34820 Assas / FR | 02 /
Brodin, Roger 26 Mas des Bruyères, Avenue de Monsieur Teste F-34070 Montpellier / FR | 03 /
Kan, Jean-Paul 7, rue du Vallon F-34830 Clapiers / FR | 04 /
Olliero, Dominique 12 Allée Jeanne Bourgeois, Hameau de l'Aiguelongue F-34100 Montpellier / FR | 05 /
Wermuth, Camille-Georges 3, rue de la Côte d'Azur F-67100 Strasbourg / FR | [1992/06] | Representative(s) | Gillard, Marie-Louise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/06] | Gillard, Marie-Louise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 91402145.6 | 30.07.1991 | [1992/06] | Priority number, date | FR19900009777 | 31.07.1990 Original published format: FR 9009777 | [1992/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0469992 | Date: | 05.02.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0469992 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07D237/20, C07D237/14, C07D237/12, C07D237/04, C07D401/12, C07D403/12, A61K31/50, C07D451/02, C07D451/04, C07D487/04 | [1992/06] | CPC: |
C07D451/04 (EP);
C07D231/14 (KR);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/26 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C07D237/04 (EP);
C07D237/12 (EP);
C07D237/14 (EP);
C07D237/20 (EP);
C07D401/12 (EP);
C07D403/12 (EP);
C07D451/02 (EP);
C07D487/04 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/06] | Title | German: | 6-Alkylpyridazinderivate, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und diese enthaltende Zusammensetzungen | [1992/06] | English: | 6-Alkylpyridazine derivatives, process for their preparation and compositions containing them | [1992/06] | French: | Dérivés d'alkyl-6 pyridazine, procédé de préparation et compositions pharmaceutiques en contenant | [1992/06] | Examination procedure | 08.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/36] | 10.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.09.1994 | DK | 21.09.1994 | ES | 21.09.1994 | GR | 21.09.1994 | NL | 21.09.1994 | SE | 21.12.1994 | [2002/25] |
Former [2000/05] | AT | 21.09.1994 | |
DK | 21.09.1994 | ||
GR | 21.09.1994 | ||
NL | 21.09.1994 | ||
SE | 21.12.1994 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 21.09.1994 | |
DK | 21.09.1994 | ||
NL | 21.09.1994 | ||
SE | 21.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/35] | AT | 21.09.1994 | |
NL | 21.09.1994 | ||
SE | 21.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/29] | AT | 21.09.1994 | |
SE | 21.12.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0072726 (SANOFI SA [FR]); | [A]EP0074863 (SANOFI SA [FR]); | [A]EP0117171 (SANOFI SA [FR]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 110, no. 1, 2 janvier 1989, pages 42-43, abrégé no. 504g, Columbus, Ohio, US; G.A. PINNA et al.: "Synthesis and pharmacological study of 5-aryl-6-methyl-4,5-dihydropyridazin-3(2H)-ones and related 5-aryl-6-methylpyridazin-3(2H)-ones", & FARMACO, ED. SCI. 1988, 43(6), 539-49 | [X] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 30, no. 2, février 1987, pages 239-249, Washington, DC, US; C.-G. WERMUTH et al.: "Synthesis and structure-activity relationships of a series of aminopyridazine derivatives of gamma-aminobutyric acid acting as selective GABA-A antagonists" |