EP0471617 - Sealing strip for arrow-type projectile [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GIAT Industries 13, route de la Minière F-78034 Versailles Cédex / FR | [1992/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berville, Marc Boistier Cerbois F-18120 Lury sur Atnon / FR | 02 /
Queille, Laurent 2, rue du Capitaine Locard F-18000 Bourges / FR | [1992/08] | Application number, filing date | 91402230.6 | 12.08.1991 | [1992/08] | Priority number, date | FR19900010285 | 13.08.1990 Original published format: FR 9010285 | [1992/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0471617 | Date: | 19.02.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0471617 | Date: | 07.06.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F42B14/06 | [1992/08] | CPC: |
F42B14/067 (EP,US);
F42B14/061 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/08] | Title | German: | Dichtungsband für Pfeilgeschoss | [1992/08] | English: | Sealing strip for arrow-type projectile | [1992/08] | French: | Ceinture d'étanchéité pour projectile flèche | [1992/08] | Examination procedure | 10.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/23] | 03.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 24.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/22] | Request for further processing for: | 24.03.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 24.03.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.04.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.06.1995 | ES | 07.06.1995 | NL | 07.06.1995 | BE | 31.08.1995 | CH | 31.08.1995 | LI | 31.08.1995 | [2002/25] |
Former [1997/28] | AT | 07.06.1995 | |
NL | 07.06.1995 | ||
BE | 31.08.1995 | ||
CH | 31.08.1995 | ||
LI | 31.08.1995 | ||
Former [1996/31] | AT | 07.06.1995 | |
NL | 07.06.1995 | ||
BE | 31.08.1995 | ||
Former [1996/14] | AT | 07.06.1995 | |
NL | 07.06.1995 | ||
Former [1995/52] | NL | 07.06.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]LU57539 ; | [YD]DE2537116 (BOFORS AB); | [YD]DE3332675 (RHEINMETALL GMBH [DE]) |