EP0472460 - Method and arrangement for digital radio-telephony, especially cellular radio-telephonic communication with mobiles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.12.1995 [1995/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATRA COMMUNICATION 50, rue du Président Sadate 29101 Quimper / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/09] | For all designated states MATRA COMMUNICATION 50, rue du Président Sadate F-29101 Quimper / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mouly, Michel 49, rue Louise Bruneau F-91120 Palaiseau / FR | [1992/09] | Representative(s) | Fort, Jacques CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/09] | Fort, Jacques CABINET PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91402262.9 | 19.08.1991 | [1992/09] | Priority number, date | FR19900010485 | 20.08.1990 Original published format: FR 9010485 | [1992/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0472460 | Date: | 26.02.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0472460 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04B1/66, H03M7/18 | [1992/09] | CPC: |
H04W16/12 (EP);
H03M7/18 (EP);
H04B1/713 (EP);
H04W16/02 (EP);
H04B1/715 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1992/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung für digitale Funktelefonie, insbesondere zellular-funktelefonische Kommunikation mit Mobilen | [1992/09] | English: | Method and arrangement for digital radio-telephony, especially cellular radio-telephonic communication with mobiles | [1992/09] | French: | Procédé et installation de radio téléphonie numérique, notamment de radio-téléphonie cellulaire de communication avec les mobiles | [1992/09] | Examination procedure | 06.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/18] | 16.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4850036 | [A] - IEEE Journal on Selected Areas in Communication, Vol. SAC-5, No. 5, Juin 1987, New York (US), pages 835-848; J-L. DORNSTETTER et al.: "Cellular Efficiency with Slow Frequency Hopping: Analysis of the Digital SHF900 Mobile System", le document en entier. | [A] - International Journal of Electronics, Vol. 61, No. 1, Juillet 1986, London (GB), pages 79-84; S.N. SALOUM et al.: "Binary-to-Residue and Residue-to-Binary Converters", le document en entier. | Examination | US850036 |