EP0479634 - Headlamp device for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.11.1995 [1995/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande Armée 75116 Paris / FR | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo 92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/15] | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande-Armée F-75116 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo F-92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vassal, Gérard Rue du Petit Plessis, Plessis Saint Benoist F-91410 Dourdan / FR | [1992/15] | Representative(s) | Berger, Helmut, et al Cabinet Weinstein 176 avenue Charles de Gaulle 92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/15] | Berger, Helmut, et al Cabinet Z. WEINSTEIN 20, avenue de Friedland F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91402443.5 | 13.09.1991 | [1992/15] | Priority number, date | FR19900012124 | 02.10.1990 Original published format: FR 9012124 | [1992/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0479634 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0479634 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/14 | [1992/15] | CPC: |
B60Q1/14 (EP,US);
B60Q1/18 (EP);
F21S41/125 (EP);
F21S41/683 (EP);
F21V9/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1992/15] | Title | German: | Scheinwerfereinrichtung für Fahrzeuge | [1992/15] | English: | Headlamp device for vehicle | [1992/15] | French: | Dispositif projecteur pour véhicule automobile | [1992/15] | Examination procedure | 14.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/46] | 16.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1142910 (LUC PAYET) | [A] - REVUE AUTOMOBILE vol. 51, no. 82, 18 Décembre 1987, BERNE page 17; BEHRENDT: 'LES INFRAROUGES AU SERVICE DE LA SECURITE' |