EP0477103 - Method for manufacturing superconducting device having a reduced thickness of oxide superconducting layer and superconducting device manufactured thereby [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1998 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.01.1999 [1999/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/13] | For all designated states SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES, LIMITED 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Takao, Cabinet Ballot-Schmit 7 rue Le Sueur F-75116 Paris / FR | 02 /
Inada, Hiroshi, Cabinet Ballot-Schmit 7 rue Le Sueur F-75116 Paris / FR | 03 /
Iiyama, Michitomo, Cabinet Ballot-Schmit 7 rue Le Sueur F-75116 Paris / FR | [1992/13] | Representative(s) | Ballot, Paul Denis Jacques, et al Cabinet Ballot 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | Ballot, Paul Denis Jacques, et al Cabinet Ballot-Schmit, 7, rue Le Sueur F-75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1992/13] | Ballot, Paul Denis Jacques Cabinet Ballot-Schmit 7, rue le Sueur F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91402500.2 | 19.09.1991 | [1992/13] | Priority number, date | JP19900249547 | 19.09.1990 Original published format: JP 24954790 | JP19900259159 | 28.09.1990 Original published format: JP 25915990 | [1992/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0477103 | Date: | 25.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0477103 | Date: | 15.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0477103 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01L39/22, H01L39/24 | [1992/13] | CPC: |
H10N60/207 (EP,US);
Y10S505/701 (EP);
Y10S505/728 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1997/35] |
Former [1992/13] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer supraleitenden Einrichtung mit reduzierter Dicke der supraleitenden Schicht und dadurch hergestellte supraleitende Einrichtung | [1992/13] | English: | Method for manufacturing superconducting device having a reduced thickness of oxide superconducting layer and superconducting device manufactured thereby | [1992/13] | French: | Méthode pour la fabrication d'un dispositif supraconducteur avec une couche de supraconducteur d'oxyde à une épasseur reduite et dispositif supraconducteur fabrique par cette méthode | [1992/13] | Examination procedure | 29.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/41] | 14.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.07.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0324044 (IBM [US]); | [X]EP0354804 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]); | [E]EP0475838 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) | [A] - WORKSHOP ON HIGH TEMPERATURE SUPERCONDUCTING ELECTRON DEVICES 7 June 1989, SHIKABE, JAPAN pages 281 - 284; D.F.Moore et al: 'Superconducting Thin Films for Device Applications' |