EP0479645 - Process and apparatus for the fluid catalytic cracking with downflow [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.01.1995 [1995/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 4, Avenue de Bois Préau 92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/15] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, Avenue de Bois Préau F-92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pontier, Renaud Le Village, Luzinay F-38200 Vienne / FR | 02 /
Hoffmann, Frédéric 68 Quai de Jemmapes F-75010 Paris / FR | 03 /
Galtier, Pierre Centre Hospitalier Mont SALAMON#BP 12 F-38209 Vienne Cedex / FR | [1992/15] | Application number, filing date | 91402553.1 | 25.09.1991 | [1992/15] | Priority number, date | FR19900012275 | 03.10.1990 Original published format: FR 9012275 | [1992/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0479645 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0479645 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C10G11/18, B01J8/18 | [1992/15] | CPC: |
B01J8/1809 (EP,US);
C10G11/00 (KR);
C10G11/187 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT, NL [1992/15] | Title | German: | Fluidisiertes katalytisches Krackverfahren und -apparat mit Abwärtsfliessung | [1992/15] | English: | Process and apparatus for the fluid catalytic cracking with downflow | [1992/15] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de craquage catalytique en lit fluide à courant descendant | [1992/15] | Examination procedure | 27.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/39] | 27.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4385985 (GROSS BENJAMIN, et al); | [A]US4532026 (FRIES BERNARD A [US]); | [AP]FR2655053 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) |