EP0481841 - Gas-gas heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.1995 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.04.1995 [1995/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bergounhon, René 25 Boulevard de Strasbourg F-94130 Nogent-sur-Marne / FR | [1992/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/17] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1994/09] |
Former [1992/17] | Jolly, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91402661.2 | 04.10.1991 | [1992/17] | Priority number, date | FR19900012818 | 17.10.1990 Original published format: FR 9012818 | [1992/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0481841 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0481841 | Date: | 27.04.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F26B23/00, F28F1/10 | [1994/17] | CPC: |
F26B23/002 (EP);
Y02P70/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/17] | F26B23/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/17] | Title | German: | Gas-Gas-Wärmetauscher | [1992/17] | English: | Gas-gas heat exchanger | [1992/17] | French: | Dispositif d'échange thermique gaz-gaz | [1992/17] | Examination procedure | 21.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/51] | 05.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2434976 (TEYNHAM WOODWARD, et al); | [A]DE2018533 ; | [A]US4093020 (SCHIEBER JOHN R); | [A]FR2578965 (LUXIA LTD [GB]); | [A]US4913222 (COWAN BEN [CA]) |