EP0481885 - Cooling device for a combustion chamber wall [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.1995 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.09.1995 [1995/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION "SNECMA" 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/17] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION, "S.N.E.C.M.A." 2, Boulevard du Général Martial Valin F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barbier, Gérard, Yves, Georges 1, rue Louis Blériot F-91420 Morangis / FR | 02 /
Beule, Frédéric, Bruno 160bis, rue de Paris F-94220 Charenton le Pont / FR | 03 /
Desaulty, Michel, André, Albert 2, rue de la Pierre décollée F-77240 Vert Saint Denis / FR | 04 /
Latour, Jean-Marc, Christian, Michel, Patrick 3, rue de la Poste F-41260 La Chaussée Saint Victor / FR | 05 /
Masse, Bruno, Roger, Henri 10, Avenue des Hêtres F-77000 Vaux le Penil / FR | [1994/37] |
Former [1992/17] | 01 /
Barbier, Gérard, Yves, Georges 1,rue Louis Blériot 91420-Morangis / FR | ||
02 /
Beule, Frédéric, Bruno 160Bis, rue de Paris 94220-Charenton Le Pont / FR | |||
03 /
Desaulty, Michel, André, Albert 2, rue de La Pierre décollée 77240-Vert Saint Denis / FR | |||
04 /
Latour, Jean-Marc, Christian, Michel, Patrick 3, rue de la Poste 41260-La Chaussée Saint Victor / FR | |||
05 /
Masse, Bruno, Roger, Henri 10, Avenue des Hêtres 77000-Vaux Le Penil / FR | Application number, filing date | 91402761.0 | 16.10.1991 | [1992/17] | Priority number, date | FR19900012785 | 17.10.1990 Original published format: FR 9012785 | [1992/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0481885 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0481885 | Date: | 14.09.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/08, F23R3/06 | [1992/17] | CPC: |
F23R3/06 (EP,US);
F23R3/08 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/17] | Title | German: | Kühleinrichtung für eine Brennkammerwand | [1992/17] | English: | Cooling device for a combustion chamber wall | [1992/17] | French: | Dispositif de refroidissement de la paroi d'une chambre de combustion | [1992/17] | Examination procedure | 25.10.1991 | Examination requested [1992/17] | 27.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 22.10.1993 | 03   M02   Fee paid on   27.11.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2531748 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]GB2074307 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP); | [A]EP0187731 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]); | [A]FR2450349 (SNECMA); | [A]US4700544 (FUCCI ROBERT C [US]) | [A] - BWK BRENNSTOFF WARME KRAFT. vol. 27, no. 5, Mai 1975, DUSSELDORF DE pages 201 - 205; D.WAHL, G. KAPPLER, J. SCHMIDT: 'MESSUNG DES WÄRMEÜBERGANGS AN FILMGEKÜHLTEN FLAMMROHR WANDELEMENTEN' |