EP0487367 - Valve control system with rocker arm for an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.1994 | Change - withdrawal | published on 04.05.1994 [1994/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande Armée 75116 Paris / FR | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo 92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/22] | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande-Armée F-75116 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo F-92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garnier, Patrick Résidence "La Fontaine", 1, allée de l'Ivraie F-78180 Montigny-le-Bretonneux / FR | [1992/22] | Representative(s) | Polus, Camille, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/22] | Polus, Camille, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 91402866.7 | 25.10.1991 | [1992/22] | Priority number, date | FR19900014364 | 19.11.1990 Original published format: FR 9014364 | [1992/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0487367 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F01L1/04, F01L1/12 | [1992/22] | CPC: |
F01L1/12 (EP);
F01L1/053 (EP);
F02F7/006 (EP);
F02B2275/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1992/22] | Title | German: | Ventilsteuervorrichtung mit Kipphebel für eine Brennkraftmaschine | [1992/22] | English: | Valve control system with rocker arm for an internal combustion engine | [1992/22] | French: | Dispositif de commande par culbuteur de soupape d'un moteur à combustion interne | [1992/22] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 02.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/22] | 02.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1994/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP61058907 ; | [X]GB109285 ; | [A]EP0285598 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 222 (M-504)(2278) 2 Août 1986 & JP-A-61 058 907 ( MAZDA ) 26 Mars 1986, & JP61058907 A 00000000 |