EP0486353 - Anhydrous composition containing lactulose [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.05.1996 [1996/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Salsarulo, Odette 14, rue de La Belle Feuille 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | For all designated states Salsarulo, Odette 14 rue de La Belle Feuille F-92100 Boulogne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/21] | Representative(s) | Gutmann, Ernest Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | Gutmann, Ernest Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A. 3, rue Chauveau-Lagarde F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91402927.7 | 31.10.1991 | [1992/21] | Priority number, date | FR19900013619 | 02.11.1990 Original published format: FR 9013619 | [1992/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0486353 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0486353 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/70, A61K47/06 | [1992/21] | CPC: |
A61K31/70 (EP);
A61K47/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1992/21] | Title | German: | Lactulose enthaltende wasserfreie Zusammensetzung | [1992/21] | English: | Anhydrous composition containing lactulose | [1992/21] | French: | Composition anhydre à base de lactulose | [1992/21] | Examination procedure | 26.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/52] | 05.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2154322 ; | [Y]FR2215206 | [A] - J.E.R. REYNOLDS 'MARTINDALE - THE EXTRA PHARMACOPOEIA' 1989 , THE PHARMACEUTICAL PRESS , LONDRES,GB LACTULOSE | [A] - THE BRITISH JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PRACTICE vol. 29, no. 9, 1975, pages 235 - 236; N. PORTER: 'THE USE OF LACTULOSE IN POST-HAEMORRHOIDECTOMY PATIENTS' |