EP0489608 - Composite material body of a transmission joint [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GKN GLAENZER SPICER 100 Avenue Vanderbilt 78955 Carrières-sous-Poissy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/10] | For all designated states GKN GLAENZER SPICER 100 Avenue Vanderbilt F-78955 Carrières-sous-Poissy / FR | ||
Former [1992/24] | For all designated states GLAENZER SPICER 10 Rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-78300 Poissy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Poulin, Bernard Allée de la Rocade No. 3, 155, avenue Foch F-78700 Conflans Ste Honorine / FR | 02 /
Margerie, Michel 15, chemin du Rocher F-95510 Vetheuil / FR | [1996/04] |
Former [1992/24] | 01 /
Poulin, Bernard Allée de la Rocade No. 3, 155, avenue Foch F-78700 Conflans ste Honorine / FR | ||
02 /
Margerie, Michel 15, chemin du Rocher F-95510 Vetheuil / FR | Representative(s) | Polus, Camille, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/44] | Polus, Camille, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1992/24] | Kohn, Philippe c/o CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 91403047.3 | 14.11.1991 | [1992/24] | Priority number, date | FR19900015112 | 03.12.1990 Original published format: FR 9015112 | [1992/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0489608 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0489608 | Date: | 24.01.1996 | [1996/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16D3/20, F16C3/02 | [1992/24] | CPC: |
F16D3/22 (EP,US);
F16C3/026 (US);
F16D3/2055 (EP,US);
F16D3/223 (EP,US);
F16D3/224 (EP,US);
F16D3/226 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1992/24] | Title | German: | Eine Verbundstruktur aufweisender Antriebsgelenkkörper | [1992/24] | English: | Composite material body of a transmission joint | [1992/24] | French: | Corps de joint de transmission à structure composite | [1992/24] | Examination procedure | 19.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/02] | 14.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 24.01.1996 | GB | 24.01.1996 | IT | 24.01.1996 | [2002/25] |
Former [1999/42] | GB | 24.01.1996 | |
IT | 24.01.1996 | ||
Former [1997/14] | GB | 24.01.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0335781 (GLAENZER SPICER SA [FR]); | [Y]FR1218082 (GEN MOTORS CORP); | [A]FR2586767 (NIPPON SEIKO KK [JP]); | [A]FR2508851 (SKF KUGELLAGERFABRIKEN GMBH [DE]); | [Y]GB2076936 (LOEHR & BROMKAMP GMBH); | [Y]FR1228149 (GLAENZER SPICER SA) |