EP0490719 - Hydrolastic suspension device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.10.1995 [1995/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande Armée 75116 Paris / FR | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo 92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande-Armée F-75116 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo F-92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Froumajou, Armand 19, boulevard Charles de Gaulle F-95110 Sannois / FR | [1992/25] | Representative(s) | Obolensky, Michel, et al c/o CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/46] | Obolensky, Michel, et al c/o CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1992/25] | Kohn, Philippe c/o CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 91403112.5 | 19.11.1991 | [1992/25] | Priority number, date | FR19900015437 | 10.12.1990 Original published format: FR 9015437 | [1992/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0490719 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0490719 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16F13/00 | [1992/25] | CPC: |
F16F13/10 (EP);
F16F13/264 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1992/25] | Title | German: | Hydroelastische Aufhängungsvorrichtung | [1992/25] | English: | Hydrolastic suspension device | [1992/25] | French: | Dispositif hydroélastique de suspension | [1992/25] | Examination procedure | 23.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/34] | 19.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP1158241 ; | [A]JP59144839 ; | [A]JP62137437 ; | [YD]GB2164416 ; | [A]EP0163162 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 420 (M-872)(3768) 19 Septembre 1989 & JP-A-1 158 241 ( FUKOKU KK ) 21 Juin 1989, & JP1158241 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 274 (M-345)(1711) 14 Décembre 1984 & JP-A-59 144 839 ( TOYOTA JIDOSHA KK ) 20 Août 1984, & JP59144839 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 360 (M-645)(2807) 25 Novembre 1987 & JP-A-62 137 437 ( MITSUI ENG & SHIPBUILD CO LTD ) 20 Juin 1987, & JP62137437 A 00000000 |