EP0489641 - Calibration method for a tri-dimensional metrology system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.1995 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.1995 [1995/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/24] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 31-33, rue de la Fédération F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bourdarios, Guy 8, rue de L'Erable F-78720 Dampierre en Yvelines / FR | 02 /
Rioufreyt, Philippe 24 Passage du Génie F-75012 Paris / FR | [1992/24] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1992/24] | Application number, filing date | 91403265.1 | 03.12.1991 | [1992/24] | Priority number, date | FR19900015207 | 05.12.1990 Original published format: FR 9015207 | [1992/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0489641 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/24 | [1992/24] | CPC: |
G01B11/2504 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [1992/24] | Title | German: | Kalibrierungsverfahren eines dreidimensionalen Messsystems | [1992/24] | English: | Calibration method for a tri-dimensional metrology system | [1992/24] | French: | Procédé d'étalonnage d'un système de métrologie tridimensionnelle | [1992/24] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 14.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/02] | 07.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/23] | 10.01.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1995/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1994 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2104652 ; | [Y]WO9008939 ; | [A]WO8607443 ; | [A]WO9009561 ; | [A]US4498778 | [X] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE vol. 10, no. 3, Mai 1988, NEW YORK US pages 374 - 386; GORDON ET AL: 'Real-Time Part Position Sensing' | [A] - Proceedings IEEE Computer Society Conference on Pattern Recognition & Image Processing,June 1982 Las Vegas,Nevada;pp 370-378;Tio et al: Surface Measurment for Robot Vision |