EP0497068 - Threshold circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.1996 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.1996 [1996/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BULL S.A. Tour BULL, 1, place Carpeaux 92800 Puteaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/32] | For all designated states BULL S.A. Tour BULL, 1, place Carpeaux F-92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neu, Georges 121, avenue de Malakoff, PC 8M006 F-75116 Paris / FR | 02 /
Ahn, Claude 121, avenue de Malakoff, PC 8M006 F-75116 Paris / FR | [1992/32] | Representative(s) | Denis, Hervé, et al BULL S.A. Département de la Propriété Intellectuelle PC:P4/079 rue Jean Jaurès BP 68 78340 Les Clayes-sous-Bois / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/41] | Denis, Hervé, et al Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle BULL SA, Poste courrier: LV59C18, 68 route de Versailles F-78430 Louveciennes / FR | ||
Former [1992/32] | Denis, Hervé BULL S.A., Tour BULL Cédex 74, PC/TB2803 F-92039 Paris La Défense / FR | Application number, filing date | 91403333.7 | 09.12.1991 | [1992/32] | Priority number, date | FR19900015722 | 14.12.1990 Original published format: FR 9015722 | [1992/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0497068 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/30, H03K3/353 | [1992/32] | CPC: |
H03K3/3565 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/32] | Title | German: | Schwellwert-Schaltung | [1992/32] | English: | Threshold circuit | [1992/32] | French: | Circuit à seuil | [1992/32] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 22.05.1992 | Examination requested [1992/32] | 22.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/14] | 03.11.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1995 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP5947830 ; | [Y]JP58215134 ; | [X]US4506168 ; | [X]US4612466 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 139 (E-253)[1576], 28 juin 1984; & JP-A-59 47 830 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 17-03-1984, & JP5947830 A 00000000 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 66 (E-234)[1503], 28 mars 1984; & JP-A-58 215 134 (MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.) 14-12-1983, & JP58215134 A 00000000 |