EP0491623 - Milk drink and process for its preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.1993 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.10.1993 [1993/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE EURIAL Parc Club du Perray, 3 rue de la rainière B.P. 538 F-44077 Nantes Cédex 03 / FR | [1992/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maugas, Jean-Jacques 6 rue Beaumanoir F-35000 Rennes / FR | 02 /
Le Magnen, Christine 2 rue Saint Guillaume F-35000 Rennes / FR | [1992/26] | Representative(s) | Peaucelle, Chantal, et al Cabinet Armengaud Aîné 3, Avenue Bugeaud 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/26] | Peaucelle, Chantal, et al Cabinet Armengaud Aine 3, avenue Bugeaud F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91403431.9 | 17.12.1991 | [1992/26] | Priority number, date | FR19900015845 | 18.12.1990 Original published format: FR 9015845 | [1992/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0491623 | Date: | 24.06.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A23C21/06, A23C9/156, A23C9/146 | [1992/26] | CPC: |
A23C9/1565 (EP);
A23C21/06 (EP);
A23C9/1422 (EP);
A23C9/146 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT, NL [1992/26] | Title | German: | Milchgetränk und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [1992/26] | English: | Milk drink and process for its preparation | [1992/26] | French: | Boisson lactée et procédé pour sa préparation | [1992/26] | File destroyed: | 22.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 25.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/41] | 19.05.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0029937 ; | [Y]EP0299937 ; | [X]GB1362502 ; | [Y]EP0109868 ; | [Y]EP0165105 ; | [A]FR1479361 ; | [A]EP0091369 |