EP0493203 - Device for contactless detection of moving sheets of glass [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.02.1996 [1996/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE INTERNATIONAL "Les Miroirs" 18, avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | For all designated states SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE INTERNATIONAL "Les Miroirs" 18, avenue d'Alsace F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mathivat, Denis 7 Avenue du Gros Buisson F-60150 Thourotte / FR | 02 /
Sabater, Jacques 34 Chemin des Graviers F-91190 Gif sur Yvette / FR | 03 /
Weber, Frédéric 100 Rue de Paris F-60200 Compiegne / FR | [1992/27] | Representative(s) | Muller, René SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93303 Aubervilliers / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | Muller, René SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39, quai Lucien Lefranc-BP 135 F-93303 Aubervilliers Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 91403448.3 | 19.12.1991 | [1992/27] | Priority number, date | FR19900016094 | 21.12.1990 Original published format: FR 9016094 | [1992/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0493203 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0493203 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/48, C03B29/08 | [1992/27] | CPC: |
G01S7/4812 (EP,US);
C03B29/08 (EP,US);
G01S17/04 (EP,US);
G01S7/48 (EP,US);
G01S7/4818 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, LU [1992/27] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur berührungslosen Detektion von sich bewegenden Glasscheiben | [1992/27] | English: | Device for contactless detection of moving sheets of glass | [1992/27] | French: | Dispositif de détection sans contact de feuilles de verre en mouvement | [1992/27] | Examination procedure | 30.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/04] | 11.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0267850 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR], et al); | [A]FR2567651 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]); | [A]FR2642417 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]) |