EP0465392 - Hygienic automatic liquids dispensing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.12.1993 [1993/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Societé à Responsabilité Limitée dite: SODA DISTRUBUTION 40, Chemin du Lavarin Nord F-84000 - Avignon / FR | [1992/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rouchouze, Jean-François Résidence "Les Ormeaux" 51, rue Michel-Ange F-34000 Montpellier / FR | [1992/02] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | Rinuy, Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée F-75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91430015.7 | 18.06.1991 | [1992/02] | Priority number, date | FR19900008036 | 20.06.1990 Original published format: FR 9008036 | [1992/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0465392 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/07 | [1992/02] | CPC: |
B67D1/07 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, GB, IT, LI [1992/02] | Title | German: | Hygienische Vorrichtung zur automatischen Abgabe von Flüssigkeiten | [1992/02] | English: | Hygienic automatic liquids dispensing device | [1992/02] | French: | Dispositif hygiénique de distribution automatique de liquides | [1992/02] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 06.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/49] | 13.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/48] | 05.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58081770 ; | [A]FR2600875 ; | [A]US2645379 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 175 (C-179)3 Mars 1983 & JP-A-58 081 770 (UENO RIYUUZOU ET AL ) 17 Mai 1983, & JP58081770 A 00000000 |