EP0456592 - Collecting device for a lawn mower, provided with a removable bottom, allowing the cut grass to be deposited directly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.1995 [1995/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETESIA (Société en Commandite Simple) 13 rue de l'Industrie F-67160 WISSEMBOURG / FR | [1991/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [1991/46] | Representative(s) | Nuss, Pierre, et al Cabinet Nuss 10 Rue Jacques Kablé 67080 Strasbourg Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/46] | Nuss, Pierre, et al 10, rue Jacques Kablé F-67080 Strasbourg Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 91440028.8 | 05.04.1991 | [1991/46] | Priority number, date | FR19900004919 | 12.04.1990 Original published format: FR 9004919 | [1991/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0456592 | Date: | 13.11.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0456592 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/70 | [1991/46] | CPC: |
A01D43/0635 (EP,US);
A01D2101/00 (EP,US);
A01D34/63 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB [1991/46] | Title | German: | Fangvorrichtung für einen Rasenmäher, mit einem abnehmbaren Boden, die erlaubt, das Schnittgut direkt fallen zu lassen | [1991/46] | English: | Collecting device for a lawn mower, provided with a removable bottom, allowing the cut grass to be deposited directly | [1991/46] | French: | Dispositif de ramassage pour tondeuse à gazon muni d'un fond amovible permettant de déposer directement l'herbe coupée | [1991/46] | Examination procedure | 13.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/07] | 05.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0133987 (SABO MASCHF); | [A]GB2081564 (SIAG SPA); | [A]FR2557419 (WOLF OUTILS [FR]); | [A]GB500675 (JAMES OLIVER CAINE) |