EP0480863 - Chain link conveyor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.1996 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.05.1996 [1996/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASKINFABRIKKEN BAELTIX A/S Englandsvej 12 DK-7100 Vejle / DK | [1992/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Damkjaer, Poul Erik Markvangen 20 DK-7100 Vejle / DK | [1992/16] | Representative(s) | Lund, Preben, et al Larsen & Birkeholm A/S Banegardspladsen 1 P.O. Box 362 1570 Copenhagen V / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1992/16] | Lund, Preben, et al Larsen & Birkeholm A/S, Banegaardspladsen 1, P.O. Box 362 DK-1570 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 91610081.1 | 26.09.1991 | [1992/16] | Priority number, date | US19900590924 | 01.10.1990 Original published format: US 590924 | [1992/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0480863 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0480863 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B65G17/06, B65G15/02 | [1992/16] | CPC: |
B65G17/086 (EP,US);
B65G21/20 (EP,US);
B65G2201/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1992/16] | Title | German: | Plattenbandförderer | [1992/16] | English: | Chain link conveyor | [1992/16] | French: | Transporteur à palettes | [1992/16] | Examination procedure | 13.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/50] | 25.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.05.1995 | SE | 10.08.1995 | [1996/04] |
Former [1996/02] | AT | 10.05.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3442368 (HEIFETZ SIDNEY T); | [Y]US3512627 (HODLEWSKY WASYLY G, et al); | [X]GB1256590 ; | [A]US4241822 (CLARKE PETER A [GB], et al); | [X]US4958726 (FETT JUERGEN [DE], et al) | Examination | GB2037690 | - GB A 2 037 690 |