EP0473537 - Dual independent input hydraulic shutoff [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.09.1995 [1995/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/10] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building 1, Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gillott, Michael A. 15 Rye Hill Circle Somers, Connecticut 06071 / US | [1992/10] | Representative(s) | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1992/10] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 91630056.9 | 22.08.1991 | [1992/10] | Priority number, date | US19900572839 | 27.08.1990 Original published format: US 572839 | [1992/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0473537 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0473537 | Date: | 05.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F02C9/46 | [1992/10] | CPC: |
F02C9/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/10] | Title | German: | Hydraulisches Absperrventil mit zwei unabhängigen Eingängen | [1992/10] | English: | Dual independent input hydraulic shutoff | [1992/10] | French: | Soupape d'arrêt hydraulique avec deux entrées indépendantes | [1992/10] | Examination procedure | 06.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/42] | 11.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0082785 (BENDIX CORP [US]); | [A]EP0065888 (AVIAT ELECTRIC LTD [CA]); | [A]DE1199090 (BOPP & REUTHER GMBH); | [A]GB2119132 (VAPOR CORP) |