EP0480869 - Elastomeric swashplate configuration for helicopters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1995 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.1995 [1995/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/16] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building 1, Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Byrnes, Francis E. 3 Robinhood Road White Plains, New York 10605 / US | 02 /
Krauss, Albert T. 711 Hill Road Harwinton, Connecticut 06791 / US | 03 /
Hibyan, Edward S. 123 Columbine Drive Trumbull, Connecticut 06611 / US | [1992/16] | Representative(s) | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1992/16] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 91630082.5 | 10.10.1991 | [1992/16] | Priority number, date | US19900598469 | 11.10.1990 Original published format: US 598469 | [1992/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0480869 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0480869 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B64C27/605 | [1992/16] | CPC: |
B64C27/605 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/16] | Title | German: | Elastomer-Taumelscheibe eines Hubschraubers | [1992/16] | English: | Elastomeric swashplate configuration for helicopters | [1992/16] | French: | Plateau oscillant élastomerique pour hélicoptère | [1992/16] | Examination procedure | 06.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/49] | 11.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0162773 (AEROSPATIALE [FR]); | [A]GB713358 (HILLER HELICOPTERS); | [A]GB2160619 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP) |