EP0536459 - Device for automatic spray-coating of objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.04.1997 [1997/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Flexible Automation GmbH Scherbachstrasse 9 35510 Butzbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/16] | For all designated states ABB Flexible Automation GmbH Scherbachstrasse 9 D-35510 Butzbach / DE | ||
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states ABB Flexible Automation GmbH Schorbachstrasse 9 D-35510 Butzbach / DE | ||
Former [1995/32] | For all designated states ABB Fläkt Ransburg GmbH Borsigstrasse 9-11 D-63150 Heusenstamm / DE | ||
Former [1993/15] | For all designated states ABB FLÄKT RANSBURG GmbH Borsigstrasse 9-11 D-63150 Heusenstamm / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frikker, Jozsef Gravenbruchstrasse 19 W-6072 Dreieich / DE | [1993/15] | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Klaus, et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51 68128 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/15] | Rupprecht, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al c/o ABB Patent GmbH, Postfach 10 03 51 D-68128 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 91710052.1 | 18.12.1991 | [1993/15] | Priority number, date | DE19914107094 | 06.03.1991 Original published format: DE 4107094 | [1993/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0536459 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0536459 | Date: | 24.04.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B05B13/04 | [1993/15] | CPC: |
B05B13/0452 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1993/15] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum automatischen Sprühbeschichten von Gegenständen | [1993/15] | English: | Device for automatic spray-coating of objects | [1993/15] | French: | Dispositif de revêtement automatique d'objets par pulvérisation | [1993/15] | Examination procedure | 15.10.1992 | Examination requested [1993/15] | 15.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0392267 (BEHR INDUSTRIEANLAGEN [DE], et al); | [A]GB2087269 (BINKS BULLOWS LTD); | [A]US2245932 (MILLER WILLIAM G) | Examination | US4989785 |