EP0442842 - Hydraulic actuator with pressure intensifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1995 Database last updated on 11.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.03.1995 [1995/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Simson, Dionizy Oberseenerstrasse 78 CH-8405 Winterthur / CH | [1991/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/34] | Representative(s) | Tschudi, Lorenz, et al Bovard AG Patentanwälte VSP Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/34] | Tschudi, Lorenz, et al Bovard AG Patentanwälte VSP Optingenstrasse 16 CH-3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 91810039.7 | 17.01.1991 | [1991/34] | Priority number, date | CH19900000476 | 14.02.1990 Original published format: CH 47690 | [1991/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0442842 | Date: | 21.08.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0442842 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F15B15/20 | [1991/34] | CPC: |
F15B11/0325 (EP);
F15B2211/214 (EP);
F15B2211/30505 (EP);
F15B2211/7053 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1991/34] | Title | German: | Hydraulikzylinder mit Druckübersetzung | [1991/34] | English: | Hydraulic actuator with pressure intensifier | [1991/34] | French: | Vérin hydraulique avec multiplicateur de pression | [1991/34] | Examination procedure | 15.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/34] | 23.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3410089 (SNITGEN JOSEPH D); | [A]DE1296522 (GLAS MAURUS); | [AD]EP0164334 (ENFO GRUNDLAGEN FORSCHUNGS AG [CH]) |