EP0459945 - Neuromuscular electrical stimulation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Med-El Elektromedizinische Geräte GmbH Fürstenweg 77a 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/29] | For all designated states MED-EL Medical Electronics Elektro-medizinische Geräte GmbH Fürstenweg 77a 6020 Innsbruck / AT | ||
Former [1991/49] | For all designated states STIWELL S.A. 1343 Les Charbonnières / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brodard, Roland Avenue des Châtaigniers 4 CH-1844 Villeneuve / CH | [1991/49] | Representative(s) | Ganguillet, Cyril ABREMA SA Avenue du Théâtre 16 P.O. Box 5027 1002 Lausanne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Ganguillet, Cyril ABREMA Agence Brevets & Marques Ganguillet Avenue du Théâtre 16 P.O. Box 5027 1002 Lausanne / CH | ||
Former [1991/49] | Ganguillet, Cyril ABREMA Agence Brevets & Marques Ganguillet & Humphrey Rue Centrale 5 C.P. 2065 CH-1002 Lausanne / CH | Application number, filing date | 91810378.9 | 17.05.1991 | [1991/49] | Priority number, date | CH19900001781 | 26.05.1990 Original published format: CH 178190 | CH19900004066 | 20.12.1990 Original published format: CH 406690 | [1991/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0459945 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0459945 | Date: | 19.11.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/36 | [1991/49] | CPC: |
A61N1/36003 (EP,US);
A61N1/36034 (EP,US);
A61N1/37282 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/49] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur neuromuskulären Elektroreizung | [1997/47] | English: | Neuromuscular electrical stimulation device | [1991/49] | French: | Dispositif de stimulation électrique neuromusculaire | [1991/49] |
Former [1991/49] | Einrichtung zur neuromuskulärer Elektroreizung | Examination procedure | 30.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/22] | 27.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1995 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.1995 | 31.05.1996 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   14.10.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 19.11.1997 | GR | 19.11.1997 | SE | 19.02.1998 | LU | 17.05.1998 | [2004/38] |
Former [2000/05] | DK | 19.11.1997 | |
GR | 19.11.1997 | ||
SE | 19.02.1998 | ||
LU | 31.05.1998 | ||
Former [1998/35] | DK | 19.11.1997 | |
SE | 19.02.1998 | ||
Former [1998/30] | DK | 19.11.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4254776 (TANIE KAZUO, et al); | [XD]EP0197889 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]); | [XD]EP0316280 (MEDICOMPEX S A [CH]) | Examination | EP0155815 |