EP0466653 - Procedure for manufacture of a coffin from formed pulp material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/03] | Formed pulp material coffin and procedure for its manufacture | ||
[1995/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koch, Alois Industriestrasse 15 CH-9050 Appenzell / CH | [1992/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/03] | Representative(s) | patentanwälte breiter + wiedmer ag Seuzachstrasse 2 Postfach 366 8413 Neftenbach/Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1995/09] | Patentanwälte Breiter + Wiedmer AG Seuzachstrasse 2 Postfach 366 CH-8413 Neftenbach/Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1992/03] | Breiter, Heinz Patentanwälte Breiter + Wiedmer AG Postfach 366 CH-8413 Neftenbach-Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 91810532.1 | 05.07.1991 | [1992/03] | Priority number, date | CH19900002310 | 11.07.1990 Original published format: CH 231090 | [1992/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0466653 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0466653 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61G17/00, D21J3/10 | [1992/03] | CPC: |
A61G17/0073 (EP);
D21J3/10 (EP);
D21J7/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1992/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Sarges aus geformtem Pulpestoff | [1995/09] | English: | Procedure for manufacture of a coffin from formed pulp material | [1995/09] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de cerceuil en matériau de pulpe formé | [1995/09] |
Former [1992/03] | Sarg aus geformtem Pulpestoff und ein Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | ||
Former [1992/03] | Formed pulp material coffin and procedure for its manufacture | ||
Former [1992/03] | Cerceuil en matériau de pulpe formé et procédé de sa fabrication | Examination procedure | 14.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/37] | 07.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 01.03.1995 | IT | 01.03.1995 | [2002/25] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 01.03.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH420484 (WALDISPUEHL CANDID [CH]); | [Y]AU5423265 ; | [Y]US3850793 (HORNBOSTEL L, et al); | [AD]DE2644487 (IDRA AG); | [AP]EP0406783 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) |