EP0478505 - De-inking process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.1994 [1994/49] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
CH
DK
ES
FR
GB
IT
LI
NL
SE
SANDOZ LTD. Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | For:DE
SANDOZ-PATENT-GMBH Humboldtstrasse 3 79539 Lörrach / DE | For:AT
SANDOZ-ERFINDUNGEN Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunner Strasse 59 1235 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For:BE
CH
DK
ES
FR
GB
IT
LI
NL
SE
SANDOZ LTD. Lichtstrasse 35 CH-4002 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
SANDOZ-PATENT-GMBH Humboldtstrasse 3 D-79539 Lörrach / DE | |||
For:AT
SANDOZ-ERFINDUNGEN Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunner Strasse 59 A-1235 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cowman, John Stuart 12 Shay Crescent Heaton, Bradford BD9 5PW / GB | [1992/14] | Application number, filing date | 91810745.9 | 23.09.1991 | [1992/14] | Priority number, date | GB19900020967 | 26.09.1990 Original published format: GB 9020967 | GB19900023076 | 23.10.1990 Original published format: GB 9023076 | GB19900023077 | 23.10.1990 Original published format: GB 9023077 | [1992/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0478505 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0478505 | Date: | 01.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | D21C5/02 | [1992/14] | CPC: |
D21C5/027 (EP);
Y02W30/64 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum De-inken | [1992/14] | English: | De-inking process | [1992/14] | French: | Procédé de désincrage | [1992/14] | File destroyed: | 31.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 02.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/49] | 11.07.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 15.04.1994 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2125058 (ECONOMICS LAB); | [A]US4013505 (BALCAR CESTMIR, et al) | [AP] - PAPIER, DAS. vol. 45, no. 3, March 1991, DARMSTADT DE pages 89 - 96 SÜSS, H.U. ET AL. 'Zweistufigealkalisch-saure Flotation zur Eliminierung schwer entfernbarer Druckfarben aus Altpapier.' |