EP0481918 - Optical device for white light interferometry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.1996 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.04.1996 [1996/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRE SUISSE D'ELECTRONIQUE ET DE MICROTECHNIQUE S.A. Maladière 71 2007 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1992/17] | For all designated states CENTRE SUISSE D'ELECTRONIQUE ET DE MICROTECHNIQUE S.A. Maladière 71 CH-2007 Neuchâtel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Falco, Lucien Rudebins 15 CH-2088 Cressier / CH | 02 /
Voirin, Guy Rue des Brévards 6 CH-2000 Neuchâtel / CH | 03 /
Parriaux, Olivier Rue Cité-Derrière 3 CH-1005 Lausanne / CH | [1992/17] | Representative(s) | Brulliard, Joel CSEM Centre Suisse d'Electronique et de Microtechnique S.A. Jaquet Droz 1 2007 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1992/17] | Brulliard, Joel c/o CENTRE SUISSE D'ELECTRONIQUE ET DE MICROTECHNIQUE S.A. Maladière 71 CH-2007 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 91810767.3 | 30.09.1991 | [1992/17] | Priority number, date | CH19900003308 | 16.10.1990 Original published format: CH 330890 | [1992/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0481918 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0481918 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01B5/26, G01B9/02 | [1992/17] | CPC: |
G01B9/02027 (EP,US);
G01B9/02007 (EP,US);
G01B9/02028 (EP,US);
G01B9/0209 (EP,US);
G01D5/266 (EP,US);
G01B2290/25 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1992/17] | Title | German: | Optisches Gerät für Weisslichtinterferometrie | [1992/17] | English: | Optical device for white light interferometry | [1992/17] | French: | Dispositif optique à interférométrie en lumière blanche | [1992/17] | Examination procedure | 21.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/51] | 09.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.03.1994 | 30.09.1994 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   01.12.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.04.1995 | GB | 19.04.1995 | [1996/04] |
Former [1996/02] | AT | 19.04.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3232429 (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP [US]) | [AD] - Conference Proceedings OFS ¡84, 2nd Internatio- nal Conference on Optical Fiber Sensors, Stuttgart, 5-7 septembre 1984, p. 361-364, Th. Bosselman et al.: "High-accuracy position-sensing with fiber-coupled white-light interferometers" | [A] - JOURNAL OF PHYSICS E. SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS. vol. 21, no. 2, Février 1988, ISHING, BRISTOL GB pages 187 - 192; D. HICKMAN: 'An optical sensor based on temporal coherence properties' | [A] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS. vol. 26, no. 7, Mars 1990, ENAGE GB pages 452 - 453; T.A. BERKOFF ET AL.: 'Interferometric fibre displacement/strain sensor based on source coherence synthesis' |