EP0491652 - Device for shifting a valve body with a piezoelectric element for a valve and use of it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AIRMOTEC AG Analytische Geräte, Länggstrasse 19 CH-8308 Illnau / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1992/26] | For all designated states AIRMOTEC AG Analytische Geräte, Länggstrasse 19 CH-8308 Illnau / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Behm, Felix, Dr. Schulhausstrasse 12 CH-8600 Dübendorf / CH | 02 /
Streit, Peter Seewadelstrasse 3 CH-8335 Hittnau / CH | [1992/26] | Representative(s) | Frauenknecht, Alois J., et al PPS Polyvalent Patent Service AG Waldrütistrasse 21 8954 Geroldswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1992/26] | Frauenknecht, Alois J., et al c/o PPS Polyvalent Patent Service AG, Mellingerstrasse 1 CH-5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 91810802.8 | 18.10.1991 | [1992/26] | Priority number, date | CH19900003678 | 20.11.1990 Original published format: CH 367890 | [1992/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0491652 | Date: | 24.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0491652 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/02, F15B13/044 | [1992/26] | CPC: |
F16K31/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/26] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verschieben eines Ventilkörpers mit einem Piezoelement an einem Ventil sowie deren Verwendung | [1992/26] | English: | Device for shifting a valve body with a piezoelectric element for a valve and use of it | [1992/26] | French: | Dispositif pour déplacer un corps de soupape avec un élément piézoélectrique pour une soupape et application de celui-ci | [1992/26] | Examination procedure | 18.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/46] | 25.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 20.03.1996 | DK | 20.03.1996 | ES | 20.03.1996 | GR | 20.03.1996 | NL | 20.03.1996 | SE | 20.06.1996 | AT | 18.10.1996 | LU | 31.10.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | BE | 20.03.1996 | |
DK | 20.03.1996 | ||
ES | 20.03.1996 | ||
GR | 20.03.1996 | ||
SE | 20.06.1996 | ||
AT | 18.10.1996 | ||
LU | 31.10.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | BE | 20.03.1996 | |
DK | 20.03.1996 | ||
GR | 20.03.1996 | ||
SE | 20.06.1996 | ||
AT | 18.10.1996 | ||
LU | 31.10.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 20.03.1996 | |
DK | 20.03.1996 | ||
SE | 20.06.1996 | ||
AT | 18.10.1996 | ||
Former [1996/52] | BE | 20.03.1996 | |
SE | 20.06.1996 | ||
Former [1996/44] | SE | 20.06.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP63111382 ; | [A]GB2051312 (MARTONAIR LTD); | [A]GB2094940 (NISSAN MOTOR) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 352 (M-744)(3199) 21. September 1988 & JP-A-63 111 382 ( HITACHI ) 16. Mai 1988, & JP63111382 A 00000000 |