EP0503216 - Needle selection device for circular knitting machine, specially for stockings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.11.1995 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONTI FLORENTIA S.R.L. Via delle Fonti, 6B I-50010 Badia a Settimo (Firenze) / IT | [1995/02] |
Former [1992/45] | For all designated states Furia, Edoardo Via Volterrana 86 Loc. La Romola I-50020 S. Casciano Val Di Pesa Firenze / IT | ||
Former [1992/38] | For all designated states MERITEX S.r.l. Via Strozzi n. 2 I-50123 FIRENZE / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gariboldi, Franco Viale Banchiero, 9 I-10055 Condove (Torino) / IT | [1992/38] | Representative(s) | Martini, Lazzaro Studio Brevetti Ing. Dr. Lazzaro Martini s.r.l. Via dei Rustici 5 50122 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/38] | Martini, Lazzaro Studio Brevetti Ing. Dr. Lazzaro Martini s.r.l. Via dei Rustici 5 I-50122 Firenze / IT | Application number, filing date | 91830105.2 | 15.03.1991 | [1992/38] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0503216 | Date: | 16.09.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0503216 | Date: | 25.01.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D04B15/78 | [1992/38] | CPC: |
D04B15/78 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1992/38] | Title | German: | Nadelauswahlvorrichtung für Rundstrickmaschine, insbesondere für Strümpfe | [1992/38] | English: | Needle selection device for circular knitting machine, specially for stockings | [1992/38] | French: | Dispositif de sélection des aiguilles pour machine à tricoter circulaire, en particulier pour les bas | [1992/38] | Examination procedure | 21.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/38] | 04.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.04.1994 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   15.04.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 25.01.1995 | GB | 25.01.1995 | [2002/25] |
Former [1996/04] | GB | 25.01.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0379745 (SAVIO SPA [IT]); | [A]EP0249203 (HEIKO SEISAKUSHO [JP]); | [A]EP0319007 (SIPRA PATENT BETEILIGUNG [DE]) |