EP0470059 - Bag opening device for automatically opening plastic bags in supermarket check-out counters incorporating bag dispensing machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.1995 [1995/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A.W.A.X. PROGETTAZIONE E RICERCA S.r.l. Via Per Sassuolo, 1863 41058 Vignola (Modena) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/06] | For all designated states A.W.A.X. PROGETTAZIONE E RICERCA S.r.l. Via per Sassuolo, 1863 I-41058 Vignola (Modena) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cappi, Angelo Viale Vittorio Veneto, 586 Vignola (Modena) / IT | 02 /
Rimondi, Renato Via De Gasperi, 1 Bazzano (Bologna) / IT | [1992/06] | Representative(s) | Pizzoli, Pasquale Vincenzo, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti Via G. Carducci 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/06] | Pizzoli, Pasquale Vincenzo, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti Via G. Carducci 8 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 91830341.3 | 30.07.1991 | [1992/06] | Priority number, date | IT19900021170 | 01.08.1990 Original published format: IT 2117090 | [1992/06] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0470059 | Date: | 05.02.1992 | [1992/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B65B43/30 | [1992/06] | CPC: |
B65B43/30 (EP,US);
B65B1/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/06] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum selbsttätigen Öffnen von Kunststoffbeuteln in Beutelabgabevorrichtungen aufweisenden Warenabrechnungsanlagen für Supermärkte | [1992/06] | English: | Bag opening device for automatically opening plastic bags in supermarket check-out counters incorporating bag dispensing machines | [1992/06] | French: | Dispositif pour l'ouverture automatique de sacs en matière plastique dans des caisses de sortie pour supermarchés comprenant des dispositifs pour délivrer des sacs | [1992/06] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 31.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/16] | 27.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.02.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/31] | 03.03.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1995/31] | Request for further processing for: | 20.04.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 14.04.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.05.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1994 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1294669 (MACHF V H JANSEN & SUTORIUS NV); | [A]NL8702001 (EXPLOITATIEMAATSCHAPPIJ H J VA) |