EP0475916 - Procedure for the production of plastic footwear with counter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.1994 [1994/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DITTA FERRARIO DARIO Viale de Gemmis, 11 70059 Trani (BA) / IT | For all designated states F.LLI RENZI MARIO-PIERINO & C. - S.n.c. Via Dante Alighieri, 212 I-62012 Civitanova Marche (MC) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/12] | For all designated states DITTA FERRARIO DARIO Viale de Gemmis, 11 I-70059 Trani (BA) / IT | ||
For all designated states F.LLI RENZI MARIO-PIERINO & C. - S.n.c. Via Dante Alighieri, 212 I-62012 Civitanova Marche (MC) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ferrario, Dario Viale de Gemmis, 11 I-70059 Trani (BA) / IT | [1992/12] | Representative(s) | Baldi, Claudio Piazza Ghislieri, 3 60035 Jesi (Ancona) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/12] | Baldi, Claudio Piazza Ghislieri, 3 I-60035 Jesi (Ancona) / IT | Application number, filing date | 91830367.8 | 05.09.1991 | [1992/12] | Priority number, date | IT19900002117 | 06.09.1990 Original published format: IT 211790 | [1992/12] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0475916 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0475916 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A43D11/00, A43D65/00 | [1992/12] | CPC: |
A43B9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Kunststoffschuhs mit einer Verstärkung | [1992/12] | English: | Procedure for the production of plastic footwear with counter | [1992/12] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de schaussures en plastique avec un renforcement | [1992/12] | File destroyed: | 27.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 20.05.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/18] | 29.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 20.09.1993 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4287675 (NORTON EDWARD J, et al); | [X]EP0146438 (TECHNISYNTHESE SARL [FR], et al); | [X]EP0146208 (WOLVERINE WORLD WIDE INC [US]); | [X]US4625435 (UEDA NOBORU [JP]); | [X]US4854055 (SUGIYAMA YASUNORI [JP], et al) |