EP0453422 - A bridge construction kit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/43] | A bridge construction kit and bridge elements included therein | ||
[1994/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.1995 [1995/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KARLSKRONAVARVET AB S-371 83 Karlskrona / SE | [1991/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hasselkvist, Rolf V. Bredaviksvägen 6 S-370 23 Hasslö / SE | [1991/43] | Representative(s) | Svanfeldt, Hans-Ake, et al BRANN AB P.O. Box 1344 751 43 Uppsala / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/43] | Svanfeldt, Hans-Ake, et al DR. LUDWIG BRANN PATENTBYRA AB P.O. Box 1344 S-751 43 Uppsala / SE | Application number, filing date | 91850050.5 | 01.03.1991 | [1991/43] | Priority number, date | SE19900001382 | 18.04.1990 Original published format: SE 9001382 | [1991/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0453422 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0453422 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E01D15/12 | [1991/43] | CPC: |
E01D15/133 (EP,US);
E01D19/005 (EP,US);
E01D2101/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL [1991/43] | Title | German: | Bausatz für den Brückenbau | [1994/23] | English: | A bridge construction kit | [1994/23] | French: | Ensemble pour la construction de ponts | [1994/23] |
Former [1991/43] | Bausatz für den Brückenbau und dazugehörige Brückenelemente | ||
Former [1991/43] | A bridge construction kit and bridge elements included therein | ||
Former [1991/43] | Ensemble pour la construction de ponts et éléments de ponts y compris | Miscellaneous | EPB 1994/23: Teilanmeldung 93117568.1 eingereicht am 29/10/93 | EPB 1994/23: Divisional application 93117568.1 filed on 29/10/93 | EPB 1994/23: Demande divisionnaire 93117568.1 déposée le 29/10/93 | Examination procedure | 31.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/44] | 18.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP93117568.1 / EP0585971 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2166758 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG); | [AD]DE2540267 (KRUPP GMBH); | [AD]GB2038391 (PORSCHE AG); | [AD]DE2812531 ; | [A]EP0076597 (SECR DEFENCE BRIT [GB]) |