EP0489702 - Cutting insert and cutting tool for chip removing machining [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.1996 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2003 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): NL State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 12.03.2003 [2003/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG 811 81 Sandviken / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/24] | For all designated states SANDVIK AKTIEBOLAG S-811 81 Sandviken 1 / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pantzar, Göran Sörbyvägen 41 S-810 22 Ärsunda / SE | [1992/24] | Representative(s) | Taquist, Henrik Lennart Emanuel, et al Sandvik AB Patents & Licences Fack 811 81 Sandviken 1 / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/24] | Taquist, Lennart, et al Sandvik AB Patents & Licences Fack S-811 81 Sandviken 1 / SE | Application number, filing date | 91850299.8 | 02.12.1991 | [1992/24] | Priority number, date | SE19900003827 | 03.12.1990 Original published format: SE 9003827 | [1992/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0489702 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0489702 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0489702 | Date: | 25.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/22 | [1992/24] | CPC: |
B23C5/2213 (EP);
B23C5/2479 (US);
B23C2200/085 (EP,US);
B23C2200/125 (EP,US);
B23C2200/281 (US);
B23C2200/283 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/24] | Title | German: | Schneideinsatz und Schneidwerkzeug für maschinelles Spanabheben | [1992/24] | English: | Cutting insert and cutting tool for chip removing machining | [1992/24] | French: | Plaquette et outil de coupe pour l'usinage à enlèvement de copeaux | [1992/24] | Examination procedure | 19.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/20] | 02.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.04.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.10.1995 | BE | 25.10.1995 | DK | 25.10.1995 | ES | 25.10.1995 | NL | 25.10.1995 | LU | 31.12.1995 | SE | 25.01.1996 | [2003/11] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 25.10.1995 | |
BE | 25.10.1995 | ||
CH | 25.10.1995 | ||
DK | 25.10.1995 | ||
ES | 25.10.1995 | ||
LI | 25.10.1995 | ||
LU | 31.12.1995 | ||
NL | 31.12.1995 | ||
SE | 25.01.1996 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 25.10.1995 | |
BE | 25.10.1995 | ||
CH | 25.10.1995 | ||
DK | 25.10.1995 | ||
LI | 25.10.1995 | ||
LU | 31.12.1995 | ||
NL | 31.12.1995 | ||
SE | 25.01.1996 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 25.10.1995 | |
BE | 25.10.1995 | ||
DK | 25.10.1995 | ||
LU | 31.12.1995 | ||
NL | 31.12.1995 | ||
SE | 25.01.1996 | ||
CH | 29.01.1996 | ||
LI | 29.01.1996 | ||
Former [2000/27] | AT | 25.10.1995 | |
BE | 25.10.1995 | ||
DK | 25.10.1995 | ||
LU | 31.12.1995 | ||
NL | 31.12.1995 | ||
SE | 25.01.1996 | ||
Former [2000/06] | AT | 25.10.1995 | |
BE | 25.10.1995 | ||
DK | 25.10.1995 | ||
LU | 31.12.1995 | ||
SE | 25.01.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 25.10.1995 | |
BE | 25.10.1995 | ||
DK | 25.10.1995 | ||
SE | 25.01.1996 | ||
Former [1996/31] | AT | 25.10.1995 | |
BE | 25.10.1995 | ||
SE | 25.01.1996 | ||
Former [1996/28] | AT | 25.10.1995 | |
SE | 25.01.1996 | ||
Former [1996/23] | SE | 25.01.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8915088U ; | [A]EP0373292 (WALTER GMBH MONTANWERKE [DE]); | [X]EP0392729 (ISCAR LTD [IL]) |