EP0529180 - AC current detector and power supply circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.1997 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL BELL-SDT S.A. rue Chapelle Beaussart 101 B-6032 Mont-sur-Marchienne / BE | [1993/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Scalais, Thierry Joseph Ernest 15, rue Claskin B-4460 Grace-Hollogne / BE | 02 /
Canon, Thomas André Alexandre Arille 25, rue François B-1490 Court St. Etienne / BE | [1993/09] | Representative(s) | Vermeersch, Robert BELL TELEPHONE MANUFACTURING COMPANY Naamloze Vennootschap Patent Department Francis Wellesplein 1 B-2018 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | Vermeersch, Robert BELL TELEPHONE MANUFACTURING COMPANY Naamloze Vennootschap Patent Department Francis Wellesplein 1 B-2018 Antwerpen / BE | Application number, filing date | 91870135.0 | 30.08.1991 | [1993/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0529180 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0529180 | Date: | 20.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/335, H02M3/337 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
H02M3/3376 (EP,US);
H02M3/33592 (EP,US);
H02M7/217 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/09] | Title | German: | Wechselstrommesser und Stromversorgungsschaltkreis | [1993/09] | English: | AC current detector and power supply circuit | [1993/09] | French: | Détecteur de courant alternatif et circuit d'alimentation en puissance | [1993/09] | Examination procedure | 19.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/41] | 02.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 20.03.1996 | [2000/05] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2360208 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [X]US4717994 (DIAZ BONIFACIO [US], et al); | [Y]EP0339963 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [A]EP0359323 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) | [AD] - IEEE SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE RECORD 1985, pages 355 - 361; BLANCHARD ET AL.: 'The design of a high efficiency, low voltage power supply using MOSFET synchronous rectification and current mode control' |