EP0459969 - Self inking stamps with inking in an upside-down position [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.03.1995 [1995/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WALTER JUST GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H. Linzer Strasse 156 A-4600 Wels / AT | [1991/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fehling, Paul Römerstrasse 101 A-4600 Wels / AT | [1991/49] | Representative(s) | Hübscher, Heiner, et al Spittelwiese 7 4020 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1991/49] | Hübscher, Heiner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Spittelwiese 7 A-4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 91890068.9 | 04.04.1991 | [1991/49] | Priority number, date | AT19900001140 | 23.05.1990 Original published format: AT 114090 | [1991/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0459969 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0459969 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B41K1/40 | [1991/49] | CPC: |
B41K1/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [1991/49] | Title | German: | Selbstfärbestempel mit Oberschlagfärbung | [1991/49] | English: | Self inking stamps with inking in an upside-down position | [1991/49] | French: | Cachet auto-encreur avec encrage par le haut | [1991/49] | Examination procedure | 14.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/11] | 09.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1710633 ; | [A]US2829594 |