EP0477164 - Device for portioned delivery of free-flowing materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1994 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.07.1994 [1994/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BERNDORF BAND GesmbH Leobersdorfer Strasse 26 A-2560 Berndorf / AT | [1992/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harreither, Rupert, Dipl.-Ing. Wilhelmring 45 A-2500 Baden / AT | [1992/13] | Representative(s) | Widtmann, Georg Clusiusgasse 2/8 1090 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/13] | Widtmann, Georg, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. techn. Clusiusgasse 2/8 A-1090 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 91890207.3 | 13.09.1991 | [1992/13] | Priority number, date | AT19900001910 | 20.09.1990 Original published format: AT 191090 | [1992/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0477164 | Date: | 25.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0477164 | Date: | 04.08.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B01J4/02, B01J2/20, A23G3/02 | [1992/13] | CPC: |
A23G3/0289 (EP,US);
B01J2/20 (EP,US);
B01J4/02 (EP,US);
Y10S425/23 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1992/13] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur portionierten Abgabe von fliessfähigen Massen | [1992/13] | English: | Device for portioned delivery of free-flowing materials | [1992/13] | French: | Dispositif pour le dosage préportionné de substances coulantes | [1992/13] | Examination procedure | 23.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/26] | 23.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH105767 ; | [A]GB763704 (L W A LTD); | [A]DE1963754 (NID PTY LTD); | [A]EP0145839 (SANTRADE LTD [CH]); | [A]EP0303755 (MEIER JOHANN [AT]); | [A]EP0339325 (SANTRADE LTD [CH]) |