EP0478534 - Device for dosed application or removal of a liquid on a surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.1996 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.1996 [1996/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zimmer, Johannes Ebentaler Strasse 133 A-9020 Klagenfurt / AT | [1992/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/14] | Representative(s) | Puchberger, Rolf, et al Puchberger, Berger & Partner Reichsratsstrasse 13 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | Puchberger, Rolf, Dipl. Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Dipl. Ing. Georg Puchberger Dipl. Ing. Rolf Puchberger Dipl. Ing. Peter Puchberger Singerstrasse 13 Postfach 55 A-1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 91890221.4 | 19.09.1991 | [1992/14] | Priority number, date | AT19900001940 | 25.09.1990 Original published format: AT 194090 | [1992/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0478534 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0478534 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B05C1/08, B05C11/02, B41F15/42 | [1992/24] | CPC: |
B05C1/0821 (EP);
B05C1/083 (EP);
B05C1/086 (EP);
B05C1/0865 (EP);
B05C11/025 (EP);
B41F15/42 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/14] | B05C1/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/14] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum dosierenden Auftragen oder Abnehmen von Flüssigkeiten an eine Fläche | [1992/14] | English: | Device for dosed application or removal of a liquid on a surface | [1992/14] | French: | Dispositif pour appliquer ou retirer, de manière dosée, un fluide d'une surface | [1992/14] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 07.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/50] | 18.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/33] | 20.03.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1996/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8501226 ; | [A]WO8701308 ; | [A]DE3309731 ; | [A]WO8706504 |