EP0486457 - Baking oven comprising multiple compartments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.1997 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states König, Elisabeth Ursprungweg 70 A-8045 Graz / AT | [1993/11] |
Former [1992/21] | For all designated states KÖNIG, Helmut Statteggerstrasse 80 A-8045 Graz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
König, Helmut (verstorben) / DE | [1996/23] |
Former [1992/21] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Wildhack, Helmut, et al Wildhack & Jellinek Patentanwälte OG Landstrasser Hauptstrasse 50 1030 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | Wildhack, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Leo Brauneiss Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Helmut Wildhack Dipl.-Ing. Dr.Gerhard Jellinek Landstrasser Hauptstrasse 50 Postfach 281 A-1031 Wien / AT | ||
Former [1992/21] | Wildhack, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Leo Brauneiss Dipl.-Ing. Dr. Helmut Wildhack Landstrasser Hauptstrasse 50 Postfach 281 A-1031 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 91890227.1 | 25.09.1991 | [1992/21] | Priority number, date | AT19900002093 | 17.10.1990 Original published format: AT 209390 | [1992/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0486457 | Date: | 20.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0486457 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A21B3/07 | [1992/21] | CPC: |
A21B3/07 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1992/21] | Title | German: | Etagenbackofen | [1992/21] | English: | Baking oven comprising multiple compartments | [1992/21] | French: | Four de boulangerie à étages | [1992/21] | Examination procedure | 05.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/33] | 02.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.10.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 24.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 04.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/22] | Request for further processing for: | 26.10.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 26.10.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.11.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 05.06.1996 | IT | 05.06.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 05.06.1996 | |
FR | 31.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/17] | FR | 31.10.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1308430 ; | [AP]AT391979B ; | [A]FR1298893 ; | [A]CH347495 ; | [A]FR2346975 |