EP0510005 - BORE-FINISHING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.1995 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.08.1995 [1995/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/44] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIDT, Hermann Reichenauer Str. 7 D-7410 Reutlingen 24 / DE | 02 /
AULICH, Dieter Madachstrasse 4 D-7413 Gomaringen / DE | 03 /
ESSIG, Peter Lenaustrasse 7 D-7410 Reutlingen 1 / DE | [1992/44] | Application number, filing date | 91900154.5 | 22.12.1990 | [1992/44] | WO1990DE00987 | Priority number, date | DE19904000402 | 09.01.1990 Original published format: DE 4000402 | [1992/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9110527 | Date: | 25.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0510005 | Date: | 28.10.1992 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0510005 | Date: | 31.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B23B51/10 | [1992/44] | CPC: |
B23B51/101 (EP,US);
B23B51/10 (KR);
B23B2260/036 (EP,US);
Y10S408/714 (EP,US);
Y10T408/81 (EP,US);
Y10T408/909 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/44] | Title | German: | WERKZEUG ZUR BEARBEITUNG VON BOHRUNGEN | [1992/44] | English: | BORE-FINISHING TOOL | [1992/44] | French: | OUTIL POUR L'USINAGE D'ALESAGES | [1992/44] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.1992 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 20.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/45] | 18.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US2450075 [ ] (BASHARA LAURENCE A); | US2732612 [ ]; | US3076254 [ ] (RICCI ERNEST A); | GB991611 [ ] (ENGLISH ELECTRIC CO LTD); | DE3517147 [ ] (KADIA DIAMANT [DE]) |