EP0458925 - INFRARED SENSOR SUITABLE FOR FIRE FIGHTING APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FINMECCANICA S.p.A. Piazza Monte Grappa 4 00197 Roma / IT | [1998/06] |
Former [1991/49] | For all designated states SELENIA INDUSTRIE ELETTRONICHE ASSOCIATE S.p.A. Via Tiburtina, KM 12.400 I-00131 Roma / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROGI, Giulio Via Renato Simoni, 60 I-00143 Rome / IT | 02 /
PIETRANERA, Luca Vai della Minerva, 12 I-00186 Rome / IT | [1991/49] | Representative(s) | Gustorf, Gerhard Bachstrasse 6a 84036 Landshut / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/49] | Gustorf, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Gerhard Gustorf Bachstrasse 6 A D-84036 Landshut / DE | Application number, filing date | 91900197.4 | 19.12.1990 | [1991/49] | WO1990EP02242 | Priority number, date | IT19890048685 | 20.12.1989 Original published format: IT 4868589 | [1991/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9109389 | Date: | 27.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0458925 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0458925 | Date: | 30.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G08B17/12 | [1991/49] | CPC: |
G08B15/004 (EP,US);
G08B17/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/49] | Title | German: | INFRAROTSENSOR GEEIGNET FÜR ANWENDUNGEN ZUR FEUERBEKÄMPFUNG | [1991/49] | English: | INFRARED SENSOR SUITABLE FOR FIRE FIGHTING APPLICATIONS | [1991/49] | French: | CAPTEUR A INFRAROUGES UTILISABLE DANS LA LUTTE CONTRE LES INCENDIES | [1991/49] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.1991 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.12.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/12] | 17.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 14.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.06.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 08.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 06.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 01 | 20.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/38] | Request for further processing for: | 20.06.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 20.06.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.07.1998 | Decision despatched | 28.06.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 28.06.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 09.12.1997 | Decision despatched | 11.11.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 11.11.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 28.11.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1993 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.1994 | 31.12.1995 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.1996 | 31.12.1996 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.1997 | 31.12.1997 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   26.06.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.09.1998 | BE | 30.09.1998 | CH | 30.09.1998 | LI | 30.09.1998 | NL | 30.09.1998 | LU | 19.12.1998 | DK | 31.12.1998 | SE | 31.12.1998 | [2004/38] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 30.09.1998 | |
BE | 30.09.1998 | ||
CH | 30.09.1998 | ||
LI | 30.09.1998 | ||
NL | 30.09.1998 | ||
DK | 31.12.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
SE | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [2003/07] | AT | 30.09.1998 | |
BE | 30.09.1998 | ||
CH | 30.09.1998 | ||
LI | 30.09.1998 | ||
NL | 30.09.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
SE | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 30.09.1998 | |
BE | 30.09.1998 | ||
CH | 30.09.1998 | ||
LI | 30.09.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
SE | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 30.09.1998 | |
BE | 30.09.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
SE | 31.12.1998 | ||
CH | 04.01.1999 | ||
LI | 04.01.1999 | ||
Former [2000/06] | AT | 30.09.1998 | |
BE | 30.09.1998 | ||
LU | 31.12.1998 | ||
SE | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/34] | AT | 30.09.1998 | |
BE | 30.09.1998 | ||
SE | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | BE | 30.09.1998 | |
SE | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | BE | 30.09.1998 | Cited in | International search | US3017513 [ ] (MESSELT STEPHEN J); | FR2151148 [ ] (DETECTION ELECTRO FSE); | US4855718 [ ] (CHOLIN JOHN M [US], et al) |