EP0483358 - ULTRA THIN QUARTZ CRYSTAL FILTER ELEMENT OF MULTIPLE MODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 25.04.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.1997 | Revocation of patent | published on 11.06.1997 [1997/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYO COMMUNICATION EQUIPMENT CO. LTD. 1-1, Koyato 2-chome, Samukawa-machi Kouza-gun Kanagawa 253-01 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/19] | For all designated states TOYO COMMUNICATION EQUIPMENT CO. LTD. 1-1, Koyato 2-chome, Samukawa-machi Kouza-gun, Kanagawa 253-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORITA, Takao, Toyo Communication Equipment Co. Ltd. 1-1, Koyato 2-chome Samukawa-machi Kouza-gun Kanagawa 253-01 / JP | 02 /
ISHII, Osamu, Toyo Communication Equipment Co. Ltd. 1-1, Koyato 2-chome Samukawa-machi Kouza-gun Kanagawa 253-01 / JP | 03 /
KUROSAKI, Takebumi, Toyo Communication Equipment C., Ltd. 1-1, Koyato 2-chome Samukawa-machi Kouza-gun Kanagawa 253-01 / JP | [1992/19] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Peter Arthur GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/19] | Jackson, Peter Arthur GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 91900352.5 | 22.11.1990 | [1992/19] | WO1990JP01528 | Priority number, date | JP19900136135 | 25.05.1990 Original published format: JP 13613590 | [1992/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9119352 | Date: | 12.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0483358 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0483358 | Date: | 11.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.12.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H03H9/56, H03H9/05 | [1995/41] | CPC: |
H03H9/564 (EP,US);
H03H9/1014 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/19] | H03H9/56 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/19] | Title | German: | ULTRADÜNNE QUARTZKRISTALLFILTEREINHEIT MIT MEHREREN MODEN | [1992/19] | English: | ULTRA THIN QUARTZ CRYSTAL FILTER ELEMENT OF MULTIPLE MODE | [1992/19] | French: | ELEMENT DE FILTRE EN CRISTAL DE QUARTZ ULTRA MINCE A FONCTIONNEMENT EN MODE MULTIPLE | [1992/19] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.1992 | Translation filed | 20.02.1992 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.1992 | Search fee paid | 20.02.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/19] | 09.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 31.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 01.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.06.1996
ADMISSIBLE COMPOSANTS QUARTZ ET ELECTRONIQUE 2, Rue Robert Keller 10150 Pont Sainte Marie / FR Opponent's representative Berger, Helmut Cabinet Weinstein 176 avenue Charles de Gaulle 92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.06.1996
ADMISSIBLE COMPOSANTS QUARTZ ET ELECTRONIQUE 2, Rue Robert Keller 10150 Pont Sainte Marie / FR Opponent's representative Berger, Helmut Cabinet Weinstein 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | 03.07.1996 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 30.08.1996 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 06.09.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.12.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 25.01.1997 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1997/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2823540 (KINSEKISHA LAB LTD) | [Y] - PROC OF THE 39th ANNUAL FREQUENCY SYMPOSIUM; R.C. SMYTHE et al "VHF MONOLITHIC CRYSTAL FILTERS FABRICATED BY CHEMICAL MILLING" P481-485 29-31 MAY 85; PHILADELPHIA; | International search | [Y]JPH04883752 ; | [A]JPH05135297 (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD); | [Y]JPH05197394 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) |