EP0457922 - PULSE COUNT TYPE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.08.1992 [1992/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA WACOM 5-23-4, Sakurada Washimiyamachi Kitakatsusika-gun Saitama-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/48] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA WACOM 5-23-4, Sakurada Washimiyamachi Kitakatsusika-gun, Saitama-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURAKAMI, Azuma Kabushikikaisha Wacom 23-4, Sakurada 5-chome Washimiyamachi Kitakatsushika-gun Saitama-ken 340-02 / JP | 02 /
MORII, Hiroki Kabushikikaisha Wacom 23-4, Sakurada 5-chome Washimiyamachi Kitakatsushika-gun Saitama-ken 340-02 / JP | [1991/48] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/48] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 D-33617 Bielefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 91900377.2 | 11.12.1990 | [1991/48] | WO1990JP01613 | Priority number, date | JP19890324328 | 13.12.1989 Original published format: JP 32432889 | JP19900295372 | 02.11.1990 Original published format: JP 29537290 | [1991/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9109362 | Date: | 27.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0457922 | Date: | 27.11.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033, G06K11/18 | [1991/48] | CPC: |
G06F3/038 (EP,US);
G06F3/033 (EP,US);
G06F3/0383 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/48] | Title | German: | IMPULSZÄHLERNACHRICHTENSYSTEM | [1991/48] | English: | PULSE COUNT TYPE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [1991/48] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION DU TYPE A COMPTEUR D'IMPULSIONS | [1991/48] | File destroyed: | 14.02.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.1991 | Translation filed | 25.07.1991 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.1991 | Search fee paid | 25.07.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/35] | 07.04.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents have been disclosed. | International search | [Y]JPS60153538 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JPS6134622 (NEC CORP) |