EP0504222 - AN APPARATUS FOR THE CONTROLLED INFEED, STORAGE AND DISCHARGE OF ELONGATE OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.1995 [1995/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JONSSON, Holger Tylla 4 S-781 94 Borlänge / SE | [1992/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/39] | Representative(s) | Bäckström, Leif C. Protector Leif C. Bäckström AB Sandviksvägen 32 165 65 Hässelby / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | Bäckström, Leif C. Protector Leif C. Bäckström AB P.O. Box 5132 S-165 12 Hässelby / SE | Application number, filing date | 91900388.9 | 04.12.1990 | [1992/39] | WO1990SE00800 | Priority number, date | SE19890004089 | 04.12.1989 Original published format: SE 8904089 | [1992/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9108154 | Date: | 13.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0504222 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 13.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/20 | [1992/39] | CPC: |
B65D71/02 (EP,US);
B65D85/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/39] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM EINFÜHREN, BEWAHREN UND AUSGEBEN LANGGESTRECKTER GEGENSTÄNDE | [1992/39] | English: | AN APPARATUS FOR THE CONTROLLED INFEED, STORAGE AND DISCHARGE OF ELONGATE OBJECTS | [1992/39] | French: | APPAREIL POUR LE CHARGEMENT, LE STOCKAGE ET LE DECHARGEMENT AUTOMATIQUES D'OBJETS OBLONGS | [1992/39] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.1992 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.07.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 01.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/39] | 27.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/52] | 31.07.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1995/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1993 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   17.02.1994 | 31.12.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US1189965 (KELLEY JAMES JR [US]); | [A]US3367535 (GILMAN TANGUAY WILLIAM); | [A]US3478923 (FISHER ROBERT) |