EP0504227 - COPOLYESTERS AND ARTICLES EXTRUSION BLOW-MOULDED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.1995 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport TN 37660 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/30] | For all designated states EASTMAN CHEMICAL COMPANY 100 North Eastman Road Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | ||
Former [1992/39] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUBLETT, Bobby, Jones 1205 Jerry Lane Kingsport, TN 37664 / US | 02 /
BEAVERS, Randy, Steven 915 Hidden Valley Road Kingsport, TN 37663 / US | [1992/39] | Representative(s) | Behrens, Dieter, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/16] | Behrens, Dieter, Dr.-Ing., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/39] | Buff, Michel Kodak-Pathé Département des Brevets et Licences CRT Centre de Recherches et de Technologie Zone Industrielle F-71102 Chalon sur Saône Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 91900511.6 | 28.11.1990 | [1992/39] | WO1990US06828 | Priority number, date | US19890445062 | 04.12.1989 Original published format: US 445062 | [1992/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9108247 | Date: | 13.06.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0504227 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.06.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0504227 | Date: | 07.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/199, C08G63/20 | [1992/39] | CPC: |
C08G63/20 (EP,US);
C08G63/199 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/39] | Title | German: | COPOLYESTER UND DARAUS DURCH EXTRUSIONSBLASVERFAHREN GEFORMTE GEGENSTÄNDE | [1992/39] | English: | COPOLYESTERS AND ARTICLES EXTRUSION BLOW-MOULDED THEREFROM | [1992/39] | French: | COPOLYESTERS ET ARTICLES OBTENUS A PARTIR DE CEUX-CI PAR EXTRUSION-SOUFFLAGE | [1992/39] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.1992 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 23.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/39] | 15.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.09.1994 | BE | 07.09.1994 | NL | 07.09.1994 | LU | 30.11.1994 | [2000/06] |
Former [1995/29] | AT | 07.09.1994 | |
BE | 07.09.1994 | ||
NL | 07.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/27] | BE | 07.09.1994 | |
NL | 07.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/16] | NL | 07.09.1994 | Cited in | International search | USH954005H [ ]; | FR1411665 [ ] (EASTMAN KODAK CO); | US4013624 [ ] (HOESCHELE GUENTHER KURT); | US4217440 [ ] (BARKEY KENNETH T [US]) | Examination | JP7358090 | JP59230746 | - Chemical Abstracts, vol. 81, no. 8, 26 August 1974, (Columbus, Ohio, US), see pages 100 - 101, abstract 39099m, & JP, A, 7358090, & JP7358090 A 19740826 | - Chemical Abstracts, vol 102, no. 26, 1 July 1985, (Columbus, Ohio, US), see page 49, abstract 221822w, & JP, A, 59230746, & JP59230746 A 19850701 |