EP0506717 - INTEGRATED DATA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PERKINS, John Leslie 13 Mitford Street St. Kilda, VIC 3004 / AU | [1992/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/41] | Representative(s) | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/41] | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 91900681.7 | 21.12.1990 | [1992/41] | WO1990AU00608 | Priority number, date | AU19890007993 | 22.12.1989 Original published format: AU 799389 | [1992/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9110309 | Date: | 11.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0506717 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0506717 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 11.07.1991 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00, H04M11/06, H04N1/32 | [1993/20] | CPC: |
H04N1/32713 (EP,US);
H04L69/04 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (US);
H04M11/06 (EP,US);
H04N1/00204 (EP,US);
H04N1/00206 (EP,US);
H04N1/32704 (EP,US);
H04L67/06 (EP,US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1992/41] | H04N1/00, H04M11/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/41] | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTES DATENKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [1992/41] | English: | INTEGRATED DATA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [1992/41] | French: | SYSTEME INTEGRE DE COMMUNICATION DE DONNEES | [1992/41] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.1992 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.1992 | Search fee paid | 22.07.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 22.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/41] | 26.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.10.1997 | BE | 22.10.1997 | CH | 22.10.1997 | DK | 22.10.1997 | ES | 22.10.1997 | GR | 22.10.1997 | IT | 22.10.1997 | LI | 22.10.1997 | NL | 22.10.1997 | LU | 21.12.1997 | SE | 22.01.1998 | [2004/38] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 22.10.1997 | |
BE | 22.10.1997 | ||
CH | 22.10.1997 | ||
DK | 22.10.1997 | ||
ES | 22.10.1997 | ||
GR | 22.10.1997 | ||
IT | 22.10.1997 | ||
LI | 22.10.1997 | ||
NL | 22.10.1997 | ||
LU | 31.12.1997 | ||
SE | 22.01.1998 | ||
Former [2002/25] | AT | 22.10.1997 | |
BE | 22.10.1997 | ||
CH | 22.10.1997 | ||
DK | 22.10.1997 | ||
ES | 22.10.1997 | ||
GR | 22.10.1997 | ||
IT | 22.10.1997 | ||
LI | 22.10.1997 | ||
LU | 31.12.1997 | ||
SE | 22.01.1998 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 22.10.1997 | |
BE | 22.10.1997 | ||
CH | 22.10.1997 | ||
DK | 22.10.1997 | ||
GR | 22.10.1997 | ||
IT | 22.10.1997 | ||
LI | 22.10.1997 | ||
LU | 31.12.1997 | ||
SE | 22.01.1998 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 22.10.1997 | |
BE | 22.10.1997 | ||
DK | 22.10.1997 | ||
GR | 22.10.1997 | ||
IT | 22.10.1997 | ||
LU | 31.12.1997 | ||
SE | 22.01.1998 | ||
CH | 27.01.1998 | ||
LI | 27.01.1998 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 22.10.1997 | |
BE | 22.10.1997 | ||
DK | 22.10.1997 | ||
GR | 22.10.1997 | ||
IT | 22.10.1997 | ||
LU | 31.12.1997 | ||
SE | 22.01.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 22.10.1997 | |
BE | 22.10.1997 | ||
DK | 22.10.1997 | ||
IT | 22.10.1997 | ||
SE | 22.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/46] | AT | 22.10.1997 | |
BE | 22.10.1997 | ||
DK | 22.10.1997 | ||
SE | 22.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/30] | AT | 22.10.1997 | |
DK | 22.10.1997 | ||
SE | 22.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/21] | SE | 22.01.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2189115 (PITNEY BOWES INC) | [A] - REVIEW OF THE ELECTRICAL COMMUNICATION LABORATORIES vol. 33, no. 1, 31 January 1985, TOKYO (JP) pages 79 - 89 T. YAMADA ET AL 'FACSIMILE COMMUNICATION PROTOCOL BETWEEN COMPUTERS AND FDIC' | International search | [X]AU4070385 (INTERNATIONAL COMPUTERS LTD); | [A]EP0291307 (CANON KK [JP]); | [X]US4816911 (KIRSCH KERRY F [US], et al); | [A]EP0337610 (CANON KK [JP]); | [XP]AU5184990 (SPECTRAFAX CORP) | Examination | US4827349 |