EP0555212 - FERTILITY ANALYZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOPHOS MEDICAL AB Box 5607 S-114 86 Stockholm / SE | [1993/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIGLER, Rudolf Handelsvägen 24 S-182 36 Danderyd / SE | [1993/33] | Representative(s) | Forssell, Gunilla Angelica Albihns Stockholm AB, Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/33] | Forssell, Gunilla H. Albihns Patentbyra AB, Box 3137 S-103 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 91900981.1 | 31.10.1990 | [1993/33] | WO1990SE00707 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9208122 | Date: | 14.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0555212 | Date: | 18.08.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0555212 | Date: | 12.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 14.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/51, G01N33/48 | [1993/33] | CPC: |
G01J3/4412 (EP);
G01N21/51 (EP);
G01P13/0086 (EP);
G01P3/806 (EP);
G01N2021/4707 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/33] | Title | German: | FRUCHTBARKEITSANALYSEGERÄT | [1993/33] | English: | FERTILITY ANALYZER | [1993/33] | French: | ANALYSEUR DE FECONDITE | [1993/33] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.1993 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 29.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/33] | 14.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1993 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   04.12.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 12.10.1994 | NL | 12.10.1994 | [2008/02] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 12.10.1994 | |
NL | 12.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/35] | NL | 12.10.1994 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4896967 ; | [A]EP0069092 ; | [A]US4601578 | [A] - DERWENT'S ABSTRACT, No. 88-197 395/28, SU 1 362 430, publ. week 8828 MEDICINE TECH RES. | [A] - DERWENT'S ABSTRACT, No. 85-294 616/47, SU 1 154 619, publ. week 8547 MEDICAL TECHNIQUES. | [A] - Med. & Biol. Eng. & Comput, Vol. 20, March 1982, G.P. NAYLOR et al., "Apparatur for the study of motile sperm Using microprocessoranalysis of scattered laser light", see page 207 - page 214. | [A] - Med. & Biol. Eng. & Comput., Vol 23, May 1985, J.C. EARNSHAW et al., "Automated laser light scattering system for assessment of sperm motility", see page 263 - page 268. | [A] - In "laser"- Proceedings of the International Congress on Laser in Medicine and Surgery, Bologna. June 1985. (ed. G. GALLETTI). "Translational and Rotational Swimming of Humen Spermatozoa. Maxwell Speed Distributions in the Analysis of Dynamic Laser LightScattering" (PER THYBERG et al), 1986, pp 105-110, cited in the | [A] - Cytometry, Vol. 5, pages 327-332, (1984) "Rotational and Translational Swimming of Human Spermatozoa: A Dynamic Laser Light Scattering Study", (RUDOLF RIGLER et al) cited in the application. | Examination | - Med. & Biol. Eng. & Comput, Vol. 23, May 1985 J.C. EARNSHAW et al: "Automated laser light scattering system for assessment of sperm motility", see page 263 - page 268 |