EP0505463 - SAFETY BINDING FOR SKIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SALOMON S.A. Metz-Tessy 74370 Pringy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | For all designated states SALOMON S.A. Metz-Tessy F-74370 Pringy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIGAL, Jean-Pierre Mésigny La Véni F-74330 La Balme-de-Sillingy / FR | 02 /
LEMOINE, Philippe 6, rue S.-Paul F-74000 Meythet / FR | 03 /
DESARMAUX, Pierre La Côte F-74570 Evires / FR | 04 /
SCHARY, Philippe 1, rue des Cols-Verts F-74000 Meythet / FR | [1992/40] | Application number, filing date | 91901469.6 | 13.12.1990 | [1992/40] | WO1990FR00908 | Priority number, date | FR19890016653 | 15.12.1989 Original published format: FR 8916653 | FR19900015183 | 29.11.1990 Original published format: FR 9015183 | [1992/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9108807 | Date: | 27.06.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0505463 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.06.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0505463 | Date: | 31.05.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A63C5/075 | [1992/40] | CPC: |
A63C7/1013 (EP,US);
A63C7/1026 (EP,US);
A63C7/104 (EP,US);
A63C7/1093 (EP,US);
A63C9/005 (EP,US);
A63C9/0842 (EP,US);
A63C9/08592 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, IT, LI [1992/40] | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSSKIBINDUNG | [1992/40] | English: | SAFETY BINDING FOR SKIS | [1992/40] | French: | FIXATION DE SECURITE DE SKI ALPIN | [1992/40] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.1992 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 07.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/40] | 01.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 31.05.1995 | [2008/02] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 31.05.1995 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3715126 (SCHWARZ G); | [A]FR2364673 (TMC CORP [CH]); | [X]FR2417312 (TMC CORP [CH]); | [Y]DE2838902 (ORTMAIER PETER); | [A]WO8303360 (GERBER WALTER, et al) | Examination | DE2725184 | - AT-6891/76 |