EP0506772 - A PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING A PHOSPHOSUGAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PERSTORP AB 284 80 Perstorp / SE | [1999/25] |
Former [1992/41] | For all designated states PERSTORP AB S-28480 Perstorp / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sirén, Matti Via Poporino 9 CH-6926 Montagnola / CH | [1999/25] |
Former [1999/24] | 01 /
Serén, Matti Via Poporino 9 CH-6926 Montagnola / CH | ||
Former [1992/41] | 01 /
SEREN, Matti Via Poporino, 9 CH-6926 Montagnola / CH | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/41] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91901491.0 | 18.12.1990 | [1992/41] | WO1990SE00843 | Priority number, date | SE19890004354 | 21.12.1989 Original published format: SE 8904354 | [1992/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9109604 | Date: | 11.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0506772 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1992/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0506772 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 11.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/70 | [1992/41] | CPC: |
A61K31/7004 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/41] | Title | German: | PHOSPHOZUCKER ENTHALTENDE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUBEREITUNG | [1992/41] | English: | A PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION COMPRISING A PHOSPHOSUGAR | [1992/41] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE COMPRENANT UN PHOSPHOSUCRE | [1992/41] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.1992 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 17.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/41] | 07.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.12.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 18.12.1999 | [2004/39] | Cited in | International search | [X]FR6065M ; | [X]GB1158456 (PRODOTTI ANTIBIOTICI SPA [IT]); | [X]FR7346M ; | [X]DE2508474 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH); | [X]DE2629845 (GRAZE GEB GRAZE ERIKA); | [X]DE3109202 (FOSCAMA BIOMED CHIM FARMA [IT]); | [X]FR2529459 (FOSCAMA BIOMED CHIM FARMA [IT]) |